Introduction
Acknowledgments
User Guide
Organization Charts
References
|
General Election Date: May 17, 2005 | Board Of Fire Commissioners: | Commissioner | Leni I. Boorstin | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Sep 12, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | | Lorraine Bradley | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jun 24, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | | Nirinjan Singh Khalsa | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Sep 17, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | | Jehan F. Agrama | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 18, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | | Julie Chavez Rodriquez | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jun 24, 2008 ~ Resigned: Sep 29, 2009) | | Dr. Paule Cruz Takash | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jun 27, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Mar 29, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 27, 2006) | | Dr. Yasmin Delahoussaye | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jun 24, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Feb 02, 2007 ~ Term Expired: Jun 24, 2008) | | Francisco J. Duenas | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jun 18, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | | Kara I. Carlisle | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jul 11, 2006 ~ Resigned: Oct 28, 2008) | | Melany Delacruz-Viesca | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Dec 09, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | | Evelina Fernandez | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 12, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | | Keith Rothman | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jul 11, 2006 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2010) | | |