Introduction
Acknowledgments
User Guide
Organization Charts
References
|
General Election Date: May 19, 2009 | Board Of Fire Commissioners: | Commissioner | Leni I. Boorstin | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jul 13, 2010 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2014) | | Evelina Fernandez | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jul 13, 2010 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | | Murtaza Sanwari | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jan 12, 2010 ~ Resigned: Dec 16, 2011) | | Ms. Melany Dela Cruz-Viesca | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jul 13, 2010 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2012) | | Mr. Keith Rohman | *Board Of Fire Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jul 13, 2010 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2014) | | |