General Election Date: December 07, 1868 |
Bridge Construction Committee: |
Member |
Mathew Keller |
*Levee Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 02, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Board of Equalization: Member |
(Appointed: Nov 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Polling Places Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Sep 09, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Track Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 19, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Bridge Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jul 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Land Exchange Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 20, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Board of Health Commissioners: Member |
(Appointed: May 06, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Public Notice Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Apr 15, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Fire Limits Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Dam Construction Inquiry Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Police Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Streets Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*City Council: Member |
(Elected: Dec 09, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
|
Moritz Morris |
*Board of Equalization: Member |
(Appointed: Nov 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Polling Places Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Sep 09, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Bridge Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jul 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*City Maps Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jul 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Land Exchange Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 20, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Gas Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 20, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Board of Health Commissioners: Member |
(Appointed: May 06, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Street Extension Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Apr 22, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Dam Construction Inquiry Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Gas And Repair Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Public Pound Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Lands Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Water Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*City Council: Member |
(Elected: Dec 09, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
|
Ozro W. Childs |
*Board of Equalization: Member |
(Appointed: Nov 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Track Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 19, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Bridge Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jul 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Street Extension Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Apr 22, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Public Notice Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Apr 15, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Fire Limits Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 08, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Public Pound Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1869 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*Lands Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
*City Council: Member |
(Elected: Dec 09, 1868 ~ Completed: Dec 09, 1869) |
|