General Election Date: December 04, 1871 |
License Collecting Committee: |
Member |
Oscar Macy |
*Ditch Completion Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 29, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Water Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 24, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Bond Sale Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 15, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Board of Equalization: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 09, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Purchasing Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jun 19, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Fire Engineer Employment Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jun 19, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Canal Purchase Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 30, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Board of Public Works Commissioners: Member |
(Appointed: Apr 11, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Street Ordinance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Mar 07, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Damage Settlement Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 01, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*License Collecting Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Fire and Water Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 21, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*City Council: Member, 1st Ward |
(Elected: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Police Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Finance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
|
Prudent Beaudry |
*Condemnation of Lands Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Nov 29, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Authenticating City Maps Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Nov 21, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Street Grading Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jun 27, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Board of Public Works: President |
(Appointed: Apr 11, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Canal & Reservoir Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Mar 14, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Street Ordinance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Mar 07, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Park Improvement Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 29, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Damage Settlement Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 01, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*License Collecting Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*City Council: Member, 2nd Ward |
(Elected: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Streets Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Gas Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Finance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
|
H. K. S. O'Melveny |
*Board of Equalization: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 09, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Canal Purchase Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 30, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Archives Inspection Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 16, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Canal & Reservoir Conference Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Mar 14, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Street Ordinance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Mar 07, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*Street Widening Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 22, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*License Collecting Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 04, 1872 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*City Council: President |
(Elected: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
*City Council: Member, 3rd Ward |
(Elected: Dec 11, 1871 ~ Completed: Dec 05, 1872) |
|