General Election Date: May 04, 1857 |
Construction Committee: |
Member |
Antonio Franco Coronel |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Land Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jun 01, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Finance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 11, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Police Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 11, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*City Council: President |
(Elected: May 06, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*City Council: Member |
(Elected: May 06, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
John Gregg Nichols |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Finance Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 25, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Water Committee: Member |
(Added: Nov 23, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Zanja Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 31, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Cemetary Trustee Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 10, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Streets Committee: Member |
(Added: Aug 03, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Vacant Lands Committee: Member |
(Added: Jun 22, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Zanja And Bridge Investigation Committee (Apropos the zanja on the eastside and such bridges as were deemed necessary to the growing city.): Member |
(Appointed: Jun 01, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Mayor: Mayor |
(Elected: May 06, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
Jonathan R. Scott |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
Nehemiah A. Potter |
*: Election Inspector |
(Appointed: May 03, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Zanja Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 31, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Cemetary Trustee Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Aug 10, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
John Frohling |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Revenue Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jan 25, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Finance Committee: Member |
(Added: Oct 12, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Zanja And Bridge Investigation Committee (Apropos the zanja on the eastside and such bridges as were deemed necessary to the growing city.): Member |
(Appointed: Jun 01, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Land Investigation Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Jun 01, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Vacant Lands Committee: Member |
(Added: May 18, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*Water Committee: Member |
(Appointed: May 11, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
*City Council: Member |
(Elected: May 06, 1857 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
William Wolfskill |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|
Jean Luis Sainsevain |
*Construction Committee: Member |
(Appointed: Feb 15, 1858 ~ Completed: May 10, 1858) |
|