Introduction
Acknowledgments
User Guide
Organization Charts
References
|
General Election Date: May 17, 2005 | Water and Power Commission: | Commissioner | Nikolas Patsaouras | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jun 25, 2008 ~ Resigned: Oct 28, 2008) | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 23, 2005 ~ Term Expired: Jun 25, 2008) | | Mary D. Nichols | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 09, 2005 ~ Resigned: Jul 05, 2007) | | Edith Ramirez | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 23, 2005 ~ Resigned: Feb 26, 2010) | | Thomas S. Sayles | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jun 16, 2009 ~ Removed: Aug 28, 2013) | *Industrial Development Authority: Member | (Reappointed: Jun 11, 2008 ~ Resigned: Jun 18, 2009) | *Industrial Development Authority: Member | (Appointed: Jan 30, 2008 ~ Term Expired: Jun 11, 2008) | | Jonathan Parfrey | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jan 23, 2009 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 2013) | | Wallace B. Knox | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 26, 2007 ~ Resigned: Apr 08, 2009) | | Forescee Hogan-Rowles | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Reappointed: Jun 28, 2006 ~ Resigned: May 24, 2010) | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Nov 01, 2005 ~ Term Expired: Jun 28, 2006) | | H. David Nahai | *Water and Power Commission: General Manager | (Appointed: Dec 05, 2007 ~ Resigned: Oct 02, 2009) | *Water and Power Commission: Commissioner | (Appointed: Sep 23, 2005 ~ Resigned: Oct 05, 2007) | | |