Introduction
Acknowledgments
User Guide
Organization Charts
References
|
General Election Date: May 29, 1973 | Board of Water and Power Commissioners: | Commissioner | Katherine B. Dunlap | *Board of Directors Metropolitan Water District of Southern California: Directors Representing the City of Los Angeles | (Appointed: Aug 20, 1974 ~ Completed: Jun 30, 1975) | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 24, 1973 ~ Resigned: Jul 01, 1974) | | Herbert C. Ward | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 24, 1973 ~ Term Expired: Aug 02, 1977) | | Burton J. Gindler | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 24, 1973 ~ Completed: Jun 30, 1975) | | Michael P. Glazer | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 24, 1973 ~ Completed: Jun 30, 1975) | | Henry J. Bodkin Jr. | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Aug 24, 1973 ~ Term Expired: Jun 30, 1974) | | George H. Kennedy | *Board of Water and Power Commissioners: Commissioner | (Appointed: Jul 31, 1974 ~ Completed: Jun 30, 1975) | | |